Accounts and annual returns EMBER CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 287344
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2015 12 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2014 14 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2013 13 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2012 29 July 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not Required