Accounts and annual returns THE SEBASTIAN DE FERRANTI TRUST

Charity Number: 287482
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 24 June 2016 09 September 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 24 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 24 June 2015 08 March 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 24 June 2015 Not Required
Annual return 24 June 2014 19 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 24 June 2014 Not Required
Annual return 24 June 2013 30 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 24 June 2013 Not Required