Accounts and annual returns HARBOUR LIGHTS LODGE NO 8770 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 287775
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2007 17 January 2009 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2007 Not Required