Trustees THE SOCIETY FOR PIRANDELLO STUDIES
Charity Number: 288206

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof John Barnes | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lady Julie Dashwood | Trustee | 27 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alberto Godioli | Trustee | 13 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Valeria Taddei | Trustee | 13 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALBERICA BAZZONI | Trustee | 15 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROF MICHAEL SUBIALKA | Trustee | 18 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROF ANGELO MARIA MANGINI | Trustee | 20 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROF BART VAN DEN BOSSCHE | Trustee | 20 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr SHIRLEY WYNNE VINALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF JOSEPH FARRELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Prof URSULA FANNING | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.