HIGH BARNET GOOD NEIGHBOUR SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TRANSPORT FOR ELDERLY OR DISABLED TO MEDICAL APPOINTMENTS, SHOPPING ETC. SHOPPING AND PRESCRIPTION COLLECTION ON BEHALF OF CLIENTS. SOCIAL VISITING OF THE HOUSEBOUND. REFERRAL TO OTHER AGENCIES, OCCASIONAL SOCIAL EVENTS. ASSISTANCE WITH GARDENING. TELEPHONE BEFRIENDING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,938 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
Governance
- 19 December 1983: Standard registration
- GOOD NEIGHBOURS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony David Levy | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dominic Stephen Grant | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|||||
BARRY HENDERSON | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WILLIAM PEART | Trustee | 26 March 2004 |
|
|||||
ELAINE BARBARA NICHOLSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.39k | £18.10k | £19.94k | £19.64k | £28.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.79k | £21.42k | £21.96k | £26.55k | £28.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £6.24k | £6.45k | £7.43k | £5.94k | £5.94k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITIUTION ADOPTED 12TH OCTOBER 1983
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE DISTRICT OF HIGH BARNET, HERTFORDSHIRE BEING THE AREA OF THE FORMER BARNET U.D.C. AND THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MONKEN HADLEY.
Area of benefit
PLEASE SEE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH HOUSE
WOOD STREET
BARNET
EN5 4BW
- Phone:
- 02084415678
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window