Accounts and annual returns HALESWORTH LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 288353
Charity reporting is overdue by 741 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 10 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 10 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 375 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 375 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 741 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 741 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 07 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 07 December 2021 221 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required