Accounts and annual returns JAMES MYATT TRUST

Charity Number: 288543
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2022 28 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 09 March 2022 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required