Financial history THE STOWMARKET AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 288635
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £422 £332 £56 £4.02k £746
Total expenditure £1.10k £1.04k £2.12k £1.91k £1.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A