Financial history THE CLYFFE PYPARD AND BUSHTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 288985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £9.37k £15.06k £15.81k £7.39k £9.80k
Total expenditure £5.18k £12.83k £10.39k £11.60k £11.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.55k £8.00k N/A N/A