Accounts and annual returns SKILL TRAIN LIMITED

Charity Number: 289137
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 28 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 18 November 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 19 February 2008 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 27 June 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 10 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 14 August 2006 On Time