Accounts and annual returns STALHAM TOWN HALL

Charity number: 289241
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required