Accounts and annual returns CLINICAL RESEARCH NURSES' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 289402
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2012 03 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2011 03 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2010 19 August 2011 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2009 21 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 Not Required