Accounts and annual returns THE EQUITABLE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 289548
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 10 April 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 08 July 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2014 10 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 10 July 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2013 06 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 06 August 2014 On Time