Financial history CAMBRIDGE WOMEN AND HOMELESSNESS GROUP

Charity number: 289740
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £235.77k £167.78k £148.52k £165.26k £177
Total expenditure £220.02k £153.73k £157.46k £159.86k £172
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A