Financial history FRIENDS OF HURSTBOURNE TARRANT CE PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 289751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 25/09/2019 25/09/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £12.30k £5.51k £11.84k £23.77k £26.17k
Total expenditure £11.33k £13.93k £3.57k £6.60k £22.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A