Financial history STONEHENGE SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 289823
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.47k £1.92k £3.04k £1.48k £1.88k
Total expenditure £6.32k £1.57k £2.51k £1.17k £2.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A