Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF THE PRIORY CHURCH OF ST MARY EASEBOURNE

Charity number: 289855
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 July 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 02 May 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 30 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 23 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 23 May 2014 On Time