Accounts and annual returns LAMBETH WOMEN'S PROJECT

Charity Number: 289903
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 09 December 2011 312 days late
Annual return 31 March 2009 14 February 2011 379 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 25 February 2010 25 days late
Annual return 31 March 2008 24 February 2010 389 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 24 February 2010 389 days late