Accounts and annual returns THE VICTORIA HART CANCER RESEARCH FUND

Charity Number: 290138
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2012 14 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2011 01 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2010 01 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2009 10 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required