Accounts and annual returns THE MORTON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 290353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window