Accounts and annual returns IRANIAN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 290425
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 29 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 23 March 2005 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 23 March 2005 51 days late