Accounts and annual returns TRUST PROPERTY IN CONNECTION WITH THE UKRANIAN AUTOCEPHALOUS ORTHODOX CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 290638
Charity reporting is overdue by 914 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 914 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 914 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 April 2021 163 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required