Financial history Redbourn Primary PTA

Charity Number: 290848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £42.93k £19.09k £15.90k £41.20k £44.65k
Total expenditure £21.31k £15.83k £34.63k £25.11k £72.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.00k