Financial history THE LATHAM TRUST

Charity number: 290918
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £11.00k £10.00k £10.00k £10.00k £6.00k
Total expenditure £9.19k £9.33k £12.93k £11.51k £6.90k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A