Accounts and annual returns TACADE

Charity number: 291216
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2010 29 June 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 29 June 2011 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2009 29 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 29 July 2010 On Time