Financial history THE BASINGSTOKE THEATRE TRUST

Charity number: 291374
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £60 £55 £48 £32 £8
Total expenditure £8.16k £10.01k £14.80k £29.66k £28.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A