Financial history FINEDON COMMUNITY SPORTS AND LEISURE CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 291383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £12.53k £23.82k £18.76k £13.40k £17.87k
Total expenditure £19.01k £13.26k £14.79k £29.73k £17.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.53k £13.10k £6.33k N/A