Financial history CHRISTCHURCH GILBERT AND SULLIVAN SOCIETY

Charity Number: 291712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.85k £783 £50 £7.05k £15.47k
Total expenditure £11.39k £565 £422 £11.25k £14.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A