Financial history THE BECKENHAM AMATEUR DRAMATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 291722
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £40 £1.98k £1.28k
Total expenditure £5.77k £0 £35 £700 £500
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A