Accounts and annual returns SNAP PEOPLE'S THEATRE TRUST

Charity number: 291862
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 15 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 30 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 11 October 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 20 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 20 January 2005 On Time