Accounts and annual returns KNIGHTS HILL DAY NURSERY GROUP
Charity number: 291924
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 04 April 2008 | 429 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 06 March 2006 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 06 March 2006 | 34 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 10 March 2005 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 15 August 2005 | 196 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window