Accounts and annual returns THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF HOMERTON HOSPITAL

Charity number: 292092
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 18 March 2013 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2011 12 March 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2010 04 April 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 04 April 2011 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2009 24 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 24 June 2010 On Time