Accounts and annual returns SELE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE HERTFORD

Charity number: 292263
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2009 02 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2008 13 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2007 15 October 2008 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2005 Not submitted