Accounts and annual returns FENSTANTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 292600
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 27 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 06 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 06 May 2020 On Time