Financial history THE ADVENTURE SERVICE CHALLENGE SCHEME

Charity Number: 292690
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £5.79k £7.88k £5.40k £4.48k £5.69k
Total expenditure £6.21k £3.65k £4.36k £7.26k £12.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A