Trustees THE SWAN THEATRE COMPANY

Charity Number: 292763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sally Ann Matthews Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Robert Graydon Trustee 30 August 2023
None on record
Andrew Middleton Trustee 04 July 2023
None on record
Dick Bennett Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
Adrian Harding Trustee 18 May 2021
None on record
Brian Williams Trustee 12 June 2020
None on record
Annetta Broughton Trustee 24 April 2019
None on record
Mark Payne Trustee 24 April 2019
None on record