Financial history THE NORTHAVON SINGERS

Charity number: 292782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £2.99k £2.83k £0 £2.96k £2.96k
Total expenditure £3.29k £1.99k £0 £2.55k £3.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A