Accounts and annual returns GARSTON MANOR PTA

Charity Number: 293081
Charity reporting is overdue by 1210 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days
Annual return 04 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 480 days
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 480 days
Annual return 04 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 845 days
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 845 days
Annual return 04 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1210 days
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1210 days
Annual return 04 April 2020 13 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2020 Not Required