Accounts and annual returns DORMANS YOUTH ARTS CENTRE

Charity number: 293517
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 23 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 24 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 04 February 2011 4 days late
Annual return 31 March 2009 19 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 08 February 2010 8 days late