Charity overview CROMER SCHOLARSHIPS
Charity number: 526600-5
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL PROVED 18 NOVEMBER 1937 AND SCHEMES OF 31 MAY 1967 AND 30 JULY 1976
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS OF EITHER SEX WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE ATTENDING OR HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS ATTENDED THE SCHOOL OR MOORCLOSE HIGH SCHOOL FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SCHEME 31 MAY 1967.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 31 March 1972: Standard registration
- 17 August 1993: Removed
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.