Financial history COLLISSON BEQUEST

Charity number: 294285
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017
Total gross income £5.19k £4.83k £3.29k £2.49k £16
Total expenditure £23.27k £20.65k £23.36k £15.27k £85.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A