Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF FOLKESTONE SCHOOL FOR GIRLS

Charity number: 294340
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 19 October 2019 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 July 2018 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required