Financial history EASTPOINT CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 294518
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £736.57k £899.19k £4.56m £4.30m £684.31k
Total expenditure £744.67k £1.00m £1.53m £1.03m £1.11m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £101.19k £44.73k £44.13k £44.08k £557
Income - Other trading activities £46.50k £677.03k £590.46k £504.57k £505.91k
Income - Charitable activities £569.70k £779.72k £3.86m £3.66m £157.91k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £19.18k £15.32k £59.33k £89.34k £19.94k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £678.31k £931.02k £931.09k £502.98k £318.85k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £16.63k £23.02k £22.27k £23.84k £25.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £3.22k £1.61k £2.30k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0