Accounts and annual returns WYCOMBE GENERAL TRUST

Charity number: 294548
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2008 20 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2007 12 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2006 21 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2005 22 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2004 22 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2004 22 November 2004 On Time