Accounts and annual returns TRIPSCOPE

Charity number: 294559
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2006 08 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 08 November 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 02 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 02 September 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 02 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 02 November 2004 On Time