Financial history NORTH NEWTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 294627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £17.22k £8.34k £51.37k £34.84k £37.60k
Total expenditure £9.93k £8.20k £21.62k £73.11k £38.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £26.67k £4.50k £10.00k