Financial history SOCIETY OF EQUESTRIAN ARTISTS

Charity number: 294729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £39.96k £15.76k £24.75k £23.35k £25.53k
Total expenditure £44.53k £18.36k £29.00k £27.58k £27.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A