Trustees THE LEE MOOR PUBLIC HALL AND RECREATION CLUB
Charity number: 294771

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Bryans | Chair | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kay Ashton | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Galjaardt | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Foster | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Foster | Trustee | 09 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Hird | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janice Giles | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Vincent | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.