Financial history INDEPENDENT LIVING CENTRE (SWINDON)

Charity number: 294825
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £80.89k £79.00k £84.31k £67.88k £84.62k
Total expenditure £66.86k £79.69k £70.01k £68.30k £79.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A