Trustees COBHAM MILL PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 294826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Mathew Forrest Chair 29 March 2024
None on record
Richard Gwyn Anstis Trustee 15 August 2024
None on record
Evelyn Mary Brodrick Trustee 01 February 2024
None on record
Maggie Bowen Trustee 07 November 2016
None on record
David Taylor Trustee 16 July 2012
None on record